CA SB1174 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35401.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: length limitations: motorsports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1174 Walters Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1174 Walters Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1174 Walters (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1174 Walters Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1174 Walters (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 292, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 27.) | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6066.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 2.) | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 25). | |
2012-06-18 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-06-04 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-05-21 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 3553.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-04-05 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-04 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-02 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 35401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |