CA SB1173 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
Pending: Assembly Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Hearing: Jul 14 @ 10:00 am in State Capitol, Room 437
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3558 of the Government Code, relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employment: labor relations: employee information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1173 Durazo (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateJune 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2020-03-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3558Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback