CA SB1173 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1101.1, 1101.2, 1101.3, 1101.5, and 1101.7 of, and to add Sections 1101.55 and 1101.65 to, the Civil Code, and to amend Section 81005 of the Water Code, relating to water conservation.
Title
Water-conserving plumbing fixtures: CalConserve Water
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | April 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1101.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1101.65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1101.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 81005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |