CA SB1171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 321 and 2162 of, and to add Section 2160 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electors: conditional voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1171 Stern Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1171 Stern (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-06-28SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6028.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 13).
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-04-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-05SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4542.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3).
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-02-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
2018-02-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2160New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code2162Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code321Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback