CA SB1156 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - July 13 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Hearing: Jul 13 @ 2:00 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 7.9 (commencing with Section 42435) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to hazardous waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lithium-ion batteries: illegal disposal: fire prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1156 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08AssemblyJuly 13 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2020-06-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-24SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-23SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3622.) (May 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-04-29SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2020-03-18SenateApril 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and PUB. S.
2020-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42435New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback