CA SB1155 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 114.6 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations: licenses: military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1155 Morrell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1155 Morrell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Veterans Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and V.A. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4004.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3523.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and V.A. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 114.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |