CA SB1154 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 646.91, 13700, and 18250 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 99171 and 99172 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to peace officers.
Title
Peace officers: San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1154 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1154 Hancock Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1154 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1154 Hancock Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1154 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4717.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5912.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3359.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3019.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 18250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 646.91 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |