CA SB1153 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42456 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Rechargeable Battery Recycling Act of 2006: data reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1153 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1153 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |