CA SB1144 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15002.5 and 15029 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 11100, 11106.5, 11107, 11107.1, 11165.3, 11167, 11367.5, 11470, 11643, and 11647 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 11450) of Division 10 of, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1197.2 of the Labor Code, and to amend Sections 19.8, 243, 273.5, 290.015, 290.46, 350, 836, 916.2, 964, 1048, 3000.08, 3000.09, 3001, 13885.1, and 13887.2 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: public safety omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1144 Strickland Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1144 Strickland Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Strickland (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1144 Strickland Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1144 Strickland (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 867, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4763.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-22 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6148.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-16 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-15 | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3645.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-24 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-23 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2012-05-21 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3311.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-18 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-03-09 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |