CA SB1142 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-23 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 4024.05 and 4024.5 to the Penal Code, relating to jails.
Title
The Getting Home Safe Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 4024.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4024.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1142 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1142 |