CA SB1141 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68130.5 of the Education Code, relating to public, postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: exemption from payment of nonresident tuition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1141 Limón Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1141 Limón Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1141 Limón (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1141 Limón Senate Third Reading By Nazarian (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1141 Limón (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 490, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 5310.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | June 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3870.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3785.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3272.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 68130.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |