CA SB1141 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6320 of the Family Code, relating to coercive control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic violence: coercive control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1141 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1141 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1141 Rubio et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-29 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-29 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
2020-08-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-07AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3841.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3769.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3583.) (May 22).
2020-05-13SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-05-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code6320Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback