CA SB1141 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 155.7 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: transfer to local agencies: pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Reconsideration granted (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 8. Page 3616.) Reconsideration granted. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 155.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |