CA SB114 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 22138.5 of the Education Code, relating to teachers' retirement.
Title
Teachers: retirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Leland Yee [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB114 Yee Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 114 Yee Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 68 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB114 Yee (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-27 - Assembly - SB 114 Yee Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 68 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB114 Yee (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 829, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5013.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-29 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4923.) Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4988.) | |
2012-08-28 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-27 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 12. Page 6334.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6086.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Read third time and amended. (Page 5942.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-06-15 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2012-05-17 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-01-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2685.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-31 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-26 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 26. | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-04-13 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-06 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-04-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-01 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2011-03-23 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-22 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 359.) (March 16). | |
2011-03-10 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-08 | Set for hearing March 16. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-01-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 19. | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22138.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 87483.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |