CA SB1135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 739.12 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric service: rates: Family Electric Rate Assistance program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1135 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-22 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1135 Bradford Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1135 Bradford (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-14 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-31SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m.
2018-08-23SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 5628.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-22SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 5914.)
2018-08-22SenateSet for hearing August 22.
2018-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5536.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-08-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 6411.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 8).
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 4350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4850.) (April 25).
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-11SenateApril 17 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code739.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code739.12New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback