CA SB1135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 500, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 500, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.031 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10133.53 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: notice of timely access to care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1135 Monning Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1135 Monning Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1135 Monning (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1135 Monning Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1135 Monning (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 500, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5362.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 5892.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 5.) (August 3). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 28). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 4141.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4004.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3445.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1368.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10133.662 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14450.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |