CA SB1132 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 5500.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Architects: architects-in-training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 2)SB1 132 Gal giani Con (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1132 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By SALAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1132 Galgiani (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30 Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
2016-09-28 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2016-09-28 Vetoed by the Governor.
2016-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2016-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5527.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6021.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-18AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-08AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-04AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
2016-06-30AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2016-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-06-23AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5474.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2016-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2016-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2016-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2016-05-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-05-20SenateSet for hearing May 27.
2016-04-25SenateApril 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2016-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2016-04-13SenateApril 18 hearing postponed by committee.
2016-04-08SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2016-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-03-11SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
2016-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2016-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code5500Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5500.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1132&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_bill_20160218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_bill_20160818_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_bill_20160902_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160404_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160425_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160527_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160531_0216PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160621_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160822_0236PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1132_vote_20160830_0626PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback