CA SB1131 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 554, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 554, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2166.5, 12105.5, and 12108 of, and to add Section 2166.8 to, the Elections Code, to amend Sections 6215 and 6215.2 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 3.2 (commencing with Section 6215) of Division 7 of Title 1 of, the Government Code, relating to address confidentiality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Address confidentiality: public entity employees and contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1131 Newman Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1131 Newman Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1131 Newman Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1131 Newman Third Reading Urgency By Bryan (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1131 Newman Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 554, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 5388.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 5108.) |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Set for hearing August 24. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4961.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 6027.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 3906.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3784.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3513.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (March 28). |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 12105.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 12108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2166.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2166.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 6215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6215.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |