CA SB1125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14132.100 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federally qualified health center and rural health clinic services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1125 Atkins Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1125 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1125 Atkins et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2018-09-27 Vetoed by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 6186.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-28AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4407.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4852.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14132.100Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback