CA SB1124 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1770 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 401 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to unfair business practices.
Title
Deceptive practices: service members and veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 2 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1770 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |