CA SB1121 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 63100) to Division 1 of Title 6.7 of the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
California Climate Technology and Infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 De Le (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1121 De Le (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 23). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and A. & A.R. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3601.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3256.) (April 24). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15880 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 63100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 26100 | New Code | See Bill Text |