CA SB112 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1860) to Division 8 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans.
Title
California Veterans' Bill of Rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB112 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2941.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2887.) (January 12). |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Set for hearing January 12. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | May 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1860 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Military and Veterans Code | 713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |