CA SB1115 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-14 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Flexible work schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 0 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-14 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-05-09 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 4. Page 3460.) | |
2012-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2012-04-11 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 3122.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2012-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |