CA SB1111 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1981, 1983, and 48918 of, to add Section 1981.5 to, and to repeal Section 1981.2 of, the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: involuntary transfer: county community schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1111 Lara Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1111 Lara Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1111 Lara (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1111 Lara Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1111 Lara (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 837, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4644.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6164.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3600.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3255.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1981 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 1981.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 1981.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 1983 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48660.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48662 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48662.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48918 | Amended Code | Citation Text |