CA SB1098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12304.42 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
In-home supportive services and waiver personal care services.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 12304.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |