CA SB1094 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51210 and 51220 of the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: course of study: social sciences: civic engagement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3558.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |