CA SB1093 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 828, 829, and 830 of, and to add Sections 831, 831.5, 832, 833, 834, and 835 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to aquaculture.
Title
Mariculture: master permitting program: designation of suitable state waters.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 828 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 829 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 830 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 831 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 831.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 832 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 833 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 834 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 835 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1093 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1093 |