CA SB1090 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Sections 2701.5, 2706.1, 3301, and 3304 of, and to add Sections 2701.5.5, 2706.1.5, 3301.5, and 3304.5 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment insurance: disability and paid family leave: claim administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1090 Durazo et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1090 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Alanis (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1090 Durazo et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1090 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Alanis (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB1090 Durazo et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5748.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6789.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4209.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3971.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3757.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2701.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2701.5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2706.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2706.1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3301.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 3304.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |