CA SB1090 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 745 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: rates: default time-of-use pricing.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1090 Fuller Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1090 Fuller Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1090 Fuller Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Fuller (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6223.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6129.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3078.) (April 1). |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 745 | Amended Code | Citation Text |