CA SB1089 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14053.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 1 of Chapter 394 of the Statutes of 2011, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: juvenile inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1089 Mitchell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1089 Mitchell (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1089 Mitchell (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6047.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3145.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2992.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14053.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |