CA SB1083 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 438, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 438, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3502.3 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 2708 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to physician assistants.
Title
Physician assistants: disability certifications.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1083 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1083 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1083 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1083 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1083 Pavley Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1083 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1083 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 438, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4873.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6418.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5837.) |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3270.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3211.) (April 21). |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 3502.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2708 | Amended Code | Citation Text |