CA SB1072 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 667.5 of the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking.
Title
Violent felonies: human trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |