CA SB1072 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 71131 of, and to add Part 3.6 (commencing with Section 71130) to Division 34 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.
Title
Regional Climate Collaborative Program: technical assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1072 Leyva et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1072 Leyva Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Leyva (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1072 Leyva Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Leyva (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 377, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 6022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 14. Page 6796.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4303.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 4787.) (April 24). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in N.R. & W. pending receipt. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 71130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 71131 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |