CA SB1072 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Set for hearing May 25.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 3.6 (commencing with Section 71130) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Climate Collaborative Program: technical assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24).
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24 in N.R. & W. pending receipt.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-03SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on EQ. and N.R. & W.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71130New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback