CA SB1072 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 846 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Real property: duty of care: recreational purposes: aviation activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1072 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Fuller (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Fuller (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3235.) (April 22). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 846 | Amended Code | Citation Text |