CA SB1070 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3051 and 4801 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Youth offender parole hearings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1070 Hancock (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 3845.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3613.) (April 19). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |