CA SB107 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 34171, 34173, 34176, 34176.1, 34177, 34177.3, 34177.5, 34178, 34179, 34179.7, 34180, 34181, 34183, 34186, 34187, 34189, 34191.3, 34191.4, and 34191.5 of, and to add Sections 34170.1, 34177.7, 34179.9, and 34191.6 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 96.11 and 98 of, and to add Section 96.24 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Assembly - SB 107 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 45 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SB1 07 B.& F.R. (Leno) Con (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 325, Statutes of 2015.
2015-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2015-09-17SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
2015-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2777.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-09-11SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 5. Page 2786.)
2015-09-11SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2015-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2015-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 3133.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-09-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-09-04AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2015-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 11.) (August 27).
2015-08-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2015-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2015-03-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-03-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 388.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-03-19SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-03-18SenateFrom committee: Ordered to second reading.
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. Read first time.
2015-01-09SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code34170.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code34171Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34173Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34176Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34176.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34177Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34177.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34177.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34177.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code34178Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34179Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34179.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34179.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code34180Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34181Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34183Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34186Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34187Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34189Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34191.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34191.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34191.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code34191.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code96.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code96.24New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code98Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_107&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20150109_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20150904_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20150910_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20150916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_bill_20150922_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20150323_0324PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20150827_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20150911_0959PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20150911_1141AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_107_vote_20150911_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback