CA SB1068 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 132656 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Tri-Valley-San Joaquin Valley Regional Rail Authority: contracting: Construction Manager/General Contractor project delivery method.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1068 Eggman (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3535.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 132656 | Amended Code | Citation Text |