CA SB1064 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8693 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to structural pest control.
Title
Structural pest control: workers’ compensation insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1064 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1064 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1064 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor, Public Employment and Retirement ] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 190, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5828.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 3). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and INS. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3415.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L., P.E. & R. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3167.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and L., P.E. & R. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 8693 | New Code | See Bill Text |