CA SB1061 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2102.5 to the Elections Code, and to amend Section 12950.5 of, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 13050) to Chapter 1 of Division 6 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: voter registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3233.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3121.) (April 8). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E. & C.A. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |