CA SB1059 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1798.99.80, 1798.99.81, 1798.99.82, and 1798.99.84 of, and to add Section 1798.99.85 to, the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: data brokers.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3436.) (April 19). |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.99.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.81 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.84 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1798.99.85 | New Code | See Bill Text |