CA SB1054 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27362.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to child passenger restraint systems.
Title
Child passenger restraint systems: sale: nonprofit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-06 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-02-17 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1054&sess=0910&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1054_bill_20100216_introduced.html |