CA SB1052 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 32550, 32551, 32553, 32555, 32556, 32565, 32565.5, 32567, 32568, 32571, 32573, 32574, and 32575 of, to amend the heading of Division 22.7 (commencing with Section 32550) of, to add Section 32573.1 to, and to repeal Section 32580 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to conservancies.
Title
Baldwin Hills Conservancy: urban watersheds conservancy expansion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1052 Kamlager Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1052 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent SB1052 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 714, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5937.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3985.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3781.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | April 4 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3182.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 32550 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32551 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32553 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32556 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32565 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32565.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32567 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32568 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32573 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32573.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 32574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 32580 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |