CA SB1043 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25420 of, and to add Section 39735 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to biogas.
Title
Biogas and biomethane.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3642.) (April 20). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3393.) (April 5). |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39735 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 40106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |