CA SB1042 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1 (commencing with Section 127750) to Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 107 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to nursing.
Title
Health facilities and clinics: clinical placements: nursing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E. D. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 127750 | New Code | See Bill Text |