CA SB1040 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 415.20 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 4013 of, and to add Section 4103.5 to, the Penal Code, relating to civil actions.
Title
Civil actions: service of process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in PUB S. pending receipt. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB S. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 415.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4103.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |