CA SB1039 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 16 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 9.5 (commencing with Section 35975) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 15 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to milk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Market milk: ultra-filtered milk products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1039 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1039 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-31AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4227.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-09SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4513.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code35975New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback