CA SB1029 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 990, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 990, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 118 (commencing with Section 150500) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
One Health Program: zoonotic diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1029 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1029 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Vince Fong (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1029 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1029 Hurtado Senate Third Reading By Vince Fong (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1029 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Agriculture] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 990, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5343.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGRI. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3933.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3780.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3538.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3204.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGRI. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 150500 | New Code | See Bill Text |