CA SB1025 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 18885) to Part 11 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to libraries, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Libraries: student success cards.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 18885 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1025 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1025 |