CA SB1024 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 597 of, and to add Section 600.8 to, the Penal Code, relating to animal abuse.
Title
Animal abuse: responsible animal owner course: mandatory counseling.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1024 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1024 Wilk et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4405.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4818.) (April 24). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 286.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 596 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 600.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 600.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |